Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
1383 Fair Street, Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Myers, Michelle Patricia, against All Other Unauthorized Occupants, Doe, John, Steiner, Misty, represented by Reinbold, Leone, in the jurisdiction of Asotin County, WA, . Asotin County, WA Superior Courts with Brooke J. Burns presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrooke J. Burns Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 30, 2023 |
CategoryUnd Residential Unlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAsotin County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Designation of Clerks Papers | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerks Papers Sent | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letter TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Index TO CLERK'S PAPERS |
|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order STAYING WRIT AND CASE PENDING APPEAL AND SUPERSEDING CASE PENDING APPEAL |
|
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply DEF'S RESPY TO PLF'S LIST OF AUTHORITIES |
|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order EXTENDING TEMPORARY STAY OF WRIT OF RESTITUTION |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Brief CITATIONS RELIED UPON IN PLF'S ARGUMENT RE: SETTING SUPERSEDEAS BOND AMOUNT |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Show Cause STAY THE WRIT Judge: Risley, David |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.