Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Eggleston, Richard, filed a(n) Inj Injunction case represented by Richardson, Todd Samuel, against Washington Medical Commission, represented by Brewer, Kristin G, in the jurisdiction of Asotin County, WA, . Asotin County, WA Superior Courts with Brooke J. Burns presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrooke J. Burns Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 08, 2023 |
CategoryInj Injunction |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAsotin County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Brief SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF RE: FREEDOM FOUNDATION V. TEAMSTERS LOCAL 117 SEGEGATED FUND, 197 Wn.2n.2d 116 (2021) |
|
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing TO DISMISS Judge: Burns, Brooke J |
|
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | CD Record of Proceedings | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Court Hearing Minutes | |
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing TO DISMISS Judge: Burns, Brooke J |
|
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Findings | |
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Findings PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING WASHINGTON MEDICAL COMMISSIONS MOTION TO DISMISS |
|
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply WASHINGTON MEDICAL COMMISSIONS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER CR 12(B)(6) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.