Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Cherry Hill Mhp,Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Myers, Michelle Patricia, against Eller, John, represented by Wolff, John M, in the jurisdiction of Asotin County, WA, . Asotin County, WA Superior Courts with Brooke J. Burns presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrooke J. Burns Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 11, 2023 |
CategoryUnd Residential Unlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAsotin County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Court Hearing Minutes | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | CD Record of Proceedings | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Show Cause UNLAWFUL DETAINER Judge: Burns, Brooke J |
|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit ERIC STEVEN |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Order to Show Cause WHY A WRIT OF RESTITUTION SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED |
|
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Show Cause UNLAWFUL DETAINER/MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT Judge: Burns, Brooke J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.