Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Mccammon, Lyla Kaye filed a(n) Cpo Civil Protection Order case in the jurisdiction of Asotin County, WA, . Asotin County, WA Superior Courts with Brooke J. Burns presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrooke J. Burns Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 29, 2023 |
CategoryCpo Civil Protection Order |
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAsotin County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Terminating Protection Order | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Protected Persons Motion to Terminate PO | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing MOTION TO MODIFY Judge: Burns, Brooke J |
|
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Sheriffs Return on Service | |
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Sheriffs Return on Service | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Restrained Persons Motion to Modify PO | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Protection | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Court Hearing Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.