Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Overley, Steven, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Weinmaster, Douglas T, against Babino, Joey, John Jane Doe Babino, John Jane Does I-V, represented by Smith, Kevin Ford, in the jurisdiction of Asotin County, WA, . Asotin County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2022 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAsotin County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit OF SHARON NOYES |
|
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer OF DEFENDANT |
|
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons | |
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.