Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Northwest Trustee & Management Services, Llc, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case against Ingraham, Craig A, Ingraham, Forrest K, Ingraham, Kim E, Ingraham, Theresa A, in the jurisdiction of Asotin County, WA, . Asotin County, WA Superior Courts with Brooke J. Burns presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2021 |
CategoryTdr Trust/Estate Dispute Resolution |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAsotin County, WA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing TEDRA PETITION Judge: Burns, Brooke J |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit OF LUCY DUKES |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreement ESTATE RESOLUTION AGREEMENT |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Court Hearing Minutes | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | CD Record of Proceedings | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued Defense Respondent Requested | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing TEDRA PETITION Judge: Burns, Brooke J |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order OF CONTINUANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.