Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Eggleston, Richard, Eggleston, Shannon, filed a(n) Inj Injunction case represented by Richardson, Todd Samuel, against Asotin County, A Public Agency, Asotin County Public Works Department, represented by Moberg, Gerald John, in the jurisdiction of Asotin County, WA, . Asotin County, WA Superior Courts with Gary J. Libey presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2019 |
CategoryInj Injunction |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAsotin County, WA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order ON MANDATE |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Statement AMENDED STATEMENT OF ARRANGMENTS |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR ORDER AND AMENDED JUDGMENT ON MANDATE |
|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Mandate | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Designation of Clerks Papers (ALL OF THE DOCUMENTS DESIGNATED HAVE PREVIOUSLY BEEN SENT) |
|
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerks Papers Sent | |
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
|
May 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Index TO CLERK'S PAPERS |
|
May 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Designation of Clerks Papers AMENDED |
|
May 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Index SUPPLEMENTAL INDEX TO CLERK'S PAPERS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.