Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Discover Bank, Issuer Of The Discover Card, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Doe, I, Siler, Jerri K, in the jurisdiction of Asotin County, WA, . Asotin County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2011 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationAsotin County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
December 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance 39: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; |
|
October 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment 38: JUDGMENT AND ORDER TO PAY; |
|
October 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 37: DECLARATION OF MAILING; |
|
October 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 36: DECLARATION OF MAILING; |
|
October 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion 35: MOTION FOR GARNISHMENT JUDGMENT; |
|
July 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 34: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - 2ND; |
|
May 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment 33: JUDGMENT & ORDER TO PAY; |
|
May 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 32: DECLARATION OF MAILING; |
|
May 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion and Affidavit Declaration 30: MOTION AND AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION; FOR GARNISHMENT JUDGMENT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.