Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Adams County, WA, . Adams County, WA Superior Courts with Steven B. Dixon presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2023 |
CategoryDic Dissolution Of Marriage With Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAdams County, WA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2023 | Hearing Stricken In Court Other Reason | ||
May 22, 2023 |
Motion Hearing and Order for Default and antry of Final Documents Judge: Dixon, Steven B |
||
May 22, 2023 | Court Hearing Minutes | ||
May 22, 2023 |
Presentation of Final Order
Judge: Dixon, Steven B |
||
May 12, 2023 | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | ||
May 12, 2023 | Notice of Hearing | ||
May 10, 2023 | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | ||
May 10, 2023 | Notice of Hearing | ||
April 14, 2023 |
Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel Peter Lu is withdrawing and Christopher Hoxie is Substituting |
||
February 03, 2023 | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.