Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bevenue, Austin, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Adams County, WA, . Adams County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 20, 2022 |
CategoryMst2 Minor Settlement - Civil |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAdams County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Report of Guardian Ad Litem | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit Declaration Regarding Qualifications of Proposed Settlement Guardian Ad Litem |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Appointe Guardian Ad Litem | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem | |
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.