Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Urban Financial Of America, Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Enriquez, Adolph, Enriquez, Eva, Other Unknown Occupants, in the jurisdiction of Adams County, WA, . Adams County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2017 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAdams County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated 24: ORDER OF DISMISSAL - STIPULATED; |
|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
November 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 21: NOTE FOR CALENDAR; 11-06-2017; MT TO SUBSTITUTE AND AMEND; |
|
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Hearing Cancelled Plaintiff Prosecution Requested -: CANCELLED: PLAINTIFF/PROS REQUESTED; |
|
November 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Findings 23: PROPOSED ORDER - DENYING MOTION RE; SUBSTITUTION/AMENDMENT; |
|
November 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Objection Opposition 22: OBJECTION / OPPOSITION - BY DEFENSE; TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SUB/AMEND; |
|
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Note for Calendar 21: NOTE FOR CALENDAR; 11-06-2017; MT TO SUBSTITUTE AND AMEND; |
|
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Findings 19: PROPOSED ORDER RE MOTION-SUB/AMEND; |
|
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 20: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.