Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
American Express Bank, Fsb, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Elrod, Lori, against Araujo, Melissa, in the jurisdiction of Adams County, WA, . Adams County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2016 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationAdams County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Return of Service 14: RETURN OF SERVICE (2); |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 13: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT-DEBTS; |
|
December 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice 12: NOTICE TO DEFENDANT RE GARNISHMENT; |
|
December 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment 11: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT; |
|
December 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Application 10: APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
July 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Default Judgment | |
July 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Cost Bill 9: COST BILL; |
|
July 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
July 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment -: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.