Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Progressions Credit Union, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Phillabaum, Benjamin Donald, against Pulliam, Jane Doe, Pulliam, Matthew, in the jurisdiction of Adams County, WA, . Adams County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 14, 2016 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationAdams County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 13: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 12: DECLARATION OF MAILING; |
|
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment 11: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 10: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment -: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; |
|
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Default Judgment | |
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order of Default 9: ORDER OF DEFAULT; |
|
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default 7: MOTION FOR DEFAULT & JUDGMENT; |
|
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 8: DECLARATION OF B PHILLABAUM; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.