Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Fabro, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Music, Floyd M., Music, Jane Doe, Williams, Jane Doe, Williams, Jeffrey S., in the jurisdiction of Adams County, WA, . Adams County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2014 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationAdams County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Release 26: RELEASE OF WRIT; |
|
July 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel 25: NOTICE WITHDRAW & SUBSTITUT COUNSEL; |
|
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 24: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
May 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment 23: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
May 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 22: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 21: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
March 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment 20: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
March 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit -: AFFIDAVIT -WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
March 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Application 19: APPLICATION; |
|
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Transmittal Letter Copy Filed 18: TRANSMITTAL LETTER - COPY FILED; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.