Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Self, Steven Wayne, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Self, Brittni Mae, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk city. This case was filed in Norfolk city Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2023 |
CategoryDivorce |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNorfolk city, VA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
AMEND NAME CHANGE Order Judge: DWL |
|
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Name Change Pursuant To Divorce | |
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED NC Draft Order |
|
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
NC APPLICATION Other |
|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
P-2 ORE TENUS Exhibits To A Pleading Judge: JCL |
|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
OF DIVORCE Final Decree Judge: JCL |
|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
P-1 AMEND COMP Exhibits To A Pleading Judge: JCL |
|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
OF DEF Waiver Of Notice |
|
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
AGREEMENT Stipulation |
|
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
DIV: Initial Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.