Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Stepanenko, Anatoliy, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Sidelnikova, Irina, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk city. This case was filed in Norfolk city Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 23, 2022 |
CategoryDivorce |
Last RefreshedJanuary 20, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNorfolk city, VA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
OF DIVORCE Final Decree |
|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
OF PLT Affidavit |
|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
FD ERRATA Other |
|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
ACCEPTANCE/WAIVER Waiver Of Notice |
|
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
DIV: Initial Filing |
|
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
CONFIDENTIAL Addendum |
|
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
OF PLT Affidavit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.