Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Taylor, Barbara, Taylor, Melissa, Vaiuso, Desiree, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Stone County, AR, . Stone County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 28, 2022 |
CategoryOp - Probate - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationStone County, AR |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER AUTH FINAL DISTRIBUTION | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | PET AUTH MAKE FINAL DISTRIB | |
January 02, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTERS TESTAMENTARY | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | WAIVER | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | MOF ORIGINAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.