Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Newcomb, Roy, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Stone County, AR, . Stone County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 07, 2021 |
CategoryDe - Decedent Estate Administration |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationStone County, AR |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | LETTER TO COURT | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE DISMISS RULE 41 | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER DISTRIBUTION | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | NO ACTION TAKEN | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | PET AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.