Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Isbell, Thomas, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Stone County, AR, . Stone County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 22, 2021 |
CategoryGa - Guardianship Of An Adult |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationStone County, AR |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event | MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTERS GUARDIAN PERSON/ESTATE | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINT GUARDIAN | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CONSENT | |
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | TRIAL ACKNOWLEDGED | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | TRIAL COURT ASSISTANT NOTE | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.