Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Finley, Leslie R,Jr, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Finley, Stephanie, in the jurisdiction of Stone County, AR, . Stone County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryDv - Divorce |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStone County, AR |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | DECREE OF DIVORCE | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | DEPOSITION | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | FILING - OTHER | |
September 26, 2021 | Docket Event | WAIVER | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | STANDING RESTRAINING ORDER | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | MOF ORIGINAL | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.