Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Eversmeyer, Edward Paul, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Eversmeyer, Katie, in the jurisdiction of Stone County, AR, . Stone County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 13, 2021 |
CategoryDv - Divorce |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStone County, AR |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | OCSE WAGE NOTICE | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | OCSE WAGE NOTICE | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST | |
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | NO ACTION TAKEN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.