Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cash, Jum Ed, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gibson-Cash, Chaia, in the jurisdiction of Stone County, AR, . Stone County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 12, 2021 |
CategoryDv - Divorce |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStone County, AR |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER TO DISMISS | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | MOD DISMISSED | |
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION DISMISS | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER WITH COUNTER CLAIM | |
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.