Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Goodman, Melissa M, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Goodman, Eric Adon, in the jurisdiction of Stone County, AR, . Stone County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 01, 2020 |
CategoryDv - Divorce |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStone County, AR |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | MOD DISMISSED | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISS PROT ORDER | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER SETTING COURT DATE | |
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event | TRIAL COURT ASSISTANT NOTE | |
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO PETITION | |
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED | |
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event | AOC COVERSHEET REOPEN DOM REL | |
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event | MOF ORIGINAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.