Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Kroeck, Dana Arvinell, Kroeck, Richard Robert, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Lankford, Constance, in the jurisdiction of Stone County, AR, . Stone County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 22, 2022 |
CategoryUd - Landlord/Tenant Unlawfuldetain |
Last RefreshedAugust 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationStone County, AR |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | MOD DISMISSED | |
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO NON SUIT | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO NON SUIT | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED | |
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FILED | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.