Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, filed a(n) Do - Seller Plaintiff (Debt Coll.) case against Linderman, Tammie Suzette, in the jurisdiction of Stone County, AR, . Stone County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 15, 2021 |
CategoryDo - Seller Plaintiff (Debt Coll.) |
Last RefreshedAugust 14, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationStone County, AR |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT-DEFAULT | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.