Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Citibank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Mccabe, David Lee, in the jurisdiction of Stone County, AR, . Stone County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 12, 2021 |
CategoryOc - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationStone County, AR |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | MOD DISMISSED | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT-DISMISS RULE 41 | |
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE DISMISS RULE 41 | |
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | BRIEF IN SUPPORT | |
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FILED | |
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF APPEARANCE | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.