Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Landers-Watkins, Victoria L, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Turner-Watkins, Amber, in the jurisdiction of Stone County, AR, . Stone County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2021 |
CategoryUd - Landlord/Tenant Unlawfuldetain |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationStone County, AR |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TO DISMISS | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | MOD DISMISSED | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE/REPLY | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.