Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Davis, Albert Wayne, Davis, Howard Lee, filed a(n) Om - Civil - Other case against Brown, Clinton, Davis, Tammy, Hunzeker, James, John Doe #1, John Doe #1, in the jurisdiction of Stone County, AR, . Stone County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 21, 2021 |
CategoryOm - Civil - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationStone County, AR |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event | MOD DISMISSED | |
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER TO DISMISS | |
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA ISSUED | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM COURT | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTER SETTING COURT DATE | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OTHER | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTER TO COURT | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | TRANSCRIPT | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | NO ACTION TAKEN | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTER TO COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.