Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
White River Health System, filed a(n) Do - Seller Plaintiff (Debt Coll.) case against Shepherd, Travis Wesley, in the jurisdiction of Stone County, AR, . Stone County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 24, 2020 |
CategoryDo - Seller Plaintiff (Debt Coll.) |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationStone County, AR |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | WRIT OF GARNISHMENT FILED | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | INTERROGATORIES | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT-DEFAULT | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED | |
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event | AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.