Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bailey, Gerald, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case against Buckliew Enterprises Of Clinton, in the jurisdiction of Stone County, AR, . Stone County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 22, 2020 |
CategoryLp - Premises Liability |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationStone County, AR |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | MOD DISMISSED | |
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER TO DISMISS | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION | |
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED | |
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.