Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cavalry Spv I, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Hacker, Steven Brooks, in the jurisdiction of Stone County, AR, . Stone County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 10, 2020 |
CategoryOc - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationStone County, AR |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT-DISMISS W/PREJUDICE | |
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event | MOD DISMISSED | |
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FILED | |
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED | |
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED | |
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event | AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL | |
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event | MOF ORIGINAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.