Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Hattabaugh, Shannon Rachelle, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case against Lee, Cheryl, in the jurisdiction of Scott County, AR, . Scott County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 06, 2020 |
CategoryGa - Guardianship Of An Adult |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationScott County, AR |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTE | |
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER OTHER | |
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event | ACCEPT APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN | |
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event | GUARDIANSHIP HEARING HELD | |
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTERS GUARDIAN PERSON/ESTATE | |
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER | |
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event | UNCONTESTED HEARING SCHEDULED | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | GUARDIANSHIP HEARING CONTINUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.