Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Franklin, Nathan, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Scott County, AR, . Scott County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 13, 2020 |
CategoryDe - Decedent Estate Administration |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationScott County, AR |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | SET FOR REVIEW POST-DISP | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OTHER | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION OTHER | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | OTHER HEARING CONTINUED | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF APPEARANCE | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | OTHER HEARING CANCELLED | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | OTHER HEARING SCHEDULED | |
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING ACKNOWLEDGED | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING ACKNOWLEDGED | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | OTHER HEARING SCHEDULED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.