Related Content
in Pulaski County
Case
MOSHE HILL V ERIC PARKS
Jul 22, 2024 |
HON. CARA CONNORS - 12TH DIVISION 6TH CIRCUIT |
DIVORCE |
DIVORCE |
60DR-24-2526
Case
KATHERINE LETT V JOHN LETT
Jul 24, 2024 |
HON. W. MICHAEL REIF - 13TH DIVISION 6TH CIRCUIT |
DIVORCE |
DIVORCE |
60DR-24-2572
Case
OCSE V TIMOTHY POOLE
Jul 19, 2024 |
HON. AMY D. JOHNSON - 15TH DIVISION 6TH CIRCUIT |
CUSTODY |
CUSTODY |
60DR-24-2504
Ruling
In Re: Tabag
Jul 22, 2024 |
24CV-0204603
IN RE: TABAG
Case Number: 24CV-0204603
Tentative Ruling on Petition for Change of Name: Petitioner Ramsey Anthony Viloria Tabag
also known as Ramsey C. Viloria seeks to change his name to Ramsey Viloria. All procedural
requirements of CCP §§ 1275 et. seq. have been satisfied. The Petition is GRANTED. All future
dates will be vacated, and the file closed upon the processing of the Decree Changing Name.
Ruling
SIERRA PACIFIC WAGE AND HOUR CASES
Jul 28, 2024 |
5235
SIERRA PACIFIC WAGE AND HOUR CASES
Case Number: 5235
Tentative Ruling on Case Management Conference: This coordinated proceeding is on calendar for a Case
Management Conference. The Court has reviewed the Case Management Conference Statements filed by all
parties.
STAY. The McDonald matter remains stayed pending appeal. The Court notes that the parties in the Smith case
recently submitted a Stipulation and Order seeking a stay of that matter. This was returned by the clerk due the
proposed order not being lodged separately. Additionally, the Stipulation was not fax filed and did not contain
original signatures.
STAFFING AGENCY EMPLOYEES. The Court anticipates receiving a Stipulation and Order in the
McDonald case that seeks to change the Court’s previous ruling that employes placed at SPI by staffing agencies
fall under the class definitions. The Court has an obligation to all class members and intends to discuss the reasons
for this change at today’s hearing. The Court expects that any Stipulation presented will clearly provide valid
reasons for this proposed change.
DISCOVERY. The Courts notes Plaintiff McDonald’s frustration with not receiving discovery from SPI during
the stay. The Court is not able to rule on any discovery issues during the stay and parties are not obligated to
provide discovery during the stay.
FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DATE. The Court intends to set a further Case
Management Conference and will discuss available dates with counsel.
Ruling
In Re: Dancel
Jul 27, 2024 |
24CV-0204824
IN RE: DANCEL
Case Number: 24CV-0204824
Tentative Ruling on Petition for Change of Name: Petitioner Ronald Ray Dancel aka Ronald
Arthur Coombes seeks to change his name to Ronald Arthur Dancel. All procedural requirements
of CCP §§ 1275 et. seq. have been satisfied. The Petition is GRANTED. All future dates will be
vacated, and the file closed upon the processing of the Decree Changing Name.
Ruling
In Re: Borges
Jul 28, 2024 |
24CV-0204781
IN RE: BORGES, JR
Case Number: 24CV-0204781
Tentative Ruling on Petition for Change of Name: Petitioner Brian Keith Borges, Jr. seeks to change his name
to Brian Keith Van Meter. No proof of publication has been submitted. The Court requires a Certificate of
Publication from the publishing newspaper before the Petition may be granted. If the Certificate of Publication
is provided, the Court intends to grant the Petition, vacate all future dates, and close the file.
Ruling
In Re: Tabag
Jul 25, 2024 |
24CV-0204603
IN RE: TABAG
Case Number: 24CV-0204603
Tentative Ruling on Petition for Change of Name: Petitioner Ramsey Anthony Viloria Tabag
also known as Ramsey C. Viloria seeks to change his name to Ramsey Viloria. All procedural
requirements of CCP §§ 1275 et. seq. have been satisfied. The Petition is GRANTED. All future
dates will be vacated, and the file closed upon the processing of the Decree Changing Name.
Ruling
GUALDERAMA VS GUALDERAMA
Jul 27, 2024 |
FL-24-001220
FL-24-001220 – GUALDERAMA VS GUALDERAMA Respondent’s Request for Order re Spousal Support, etc.—HEARING REQUIRED.
The only request besides spousal support is for division of community property, but the Court does not divide assets one at a time, but altogether at the end of the case, at least normally. For good cause, the Court may “bifurcate” an asset or issue and conduct an early and separate trial, but Respondent’s motion did not follow the procedures that permit the Court to grant such a motion. That said, since the prior dissolution case already divided most of the community property and decided most of the contested issues before it was dismissed, it would be in the parties’ best interests to resolve this case quickly and the parties are themselves free to divide their remaining community property however they wish. They simply need to submit a stipulation and order to the Court that reflects their agreement. The Court’s Self-Help Center offers free assistance with legal forms and procedures.
Ruling
JESSICA DALTON vs. EARL DALTON
Jul 24, 2024 |
21-FCD-07813
Parties, and counsel if represented, are ordered to appear personally or remotely for settlement conference in Department 2. You must notify the court and all other parties that you intend to appear remotely using form RA-010. In addition to providing notice, a Zoom link must be requested no later than one (1) court day before the hearing and shall be submitted to the Court through the Court’s website at https://www.amadorcourt.org/gi-zoomRequestForm.aspx.
Ruling
SIERRA PACIFIC WAGE AND HOUR CASES
Jul 23, 2024 |
5235
SIERRA PACIFIC WAGE AND HOUR CASES
Case Number: 5235
Tentative Ruling on Case Management Conference: This coordinated proceeding is on calendar for a Case
Management Conference. The Court has reviewed the Case Management Conference Statements filed by Plaintiff
Smith and Defendant Sierra Pacific Industries.
STAY. The McDonald matter remains stayed pending appeal.
CLASS NOTICE. The Court appreciates the efforts made by SPI in identifying employees placed at SPI by
staffing agencies and is in agreement with SPI’s suggestions regarding the employees at SPI placed by Sonora
Employment Agency. The Court invites Plaintiff McDonald to discuss the proposals made by SPI.
MOTIONS. There are currently no motions pending in the Smith matter. Pending in McDonald are SPI’s
Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with Court Order Due to Impossibility that was filed on August 31,
2023 and SPI’s Motion for Protective Order Regarding Preservation and Production of Video Camera Footage
that was filed on September 1, 2023. Both motions are stayed.
TRIAL DATES. McDonald is not presently set for trial. The Court notes that Plaintiffs in Smith filed their Third
Amended Complaint on February 28, 2024. SPI filed an Answer on April 2, 2024. As the matter is now at issue,
the parties should be ready to discuss a timeline for a Motion for Class Certification.
FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DATE. The Court intends to set a further Case
Management Conference and will discuss available dates with counsel.
Document
GHASSAN WALI V DEBRA WALI
Jul 19, 2024 |
HON. PATRICIA ANN JAMES - 11TH DIVISION 6TH CIRCUIT |
DIVORCE |
DIVORCE |
60DR-24-2510
Document
STEPHON HALL V KIAH HALL
Jul 25, 2024 |
HON. CASEY R. TUCKER - 2ND DIVISION 6TH CIRCUIT |
DIVORCE |
DIVORCE |
60DR-24-2583