Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Old Bridge Commercial, Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Sarsah, Joel O, in the jurisdiction of Prince William County. This case was filed in Prince William County Superior Courts with Clark Andrew Ritchie presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2023 |
CategoryGapl-Unlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedJune 09, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPrince William County, VA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Final Order DISBURSE/DISMISSED Judge: TCH |
|
June 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order PROPOSED |
|
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Praecipe REMOVE 3/1/24 |
|
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Praecipe INCREASE DAMAGES ETC 2/9 |
|
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice And Motion INCREASE DAMAGES, ETC |
|
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS |
|
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Certificate OF MAILING REQUESTS |
|
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT |
|
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Other 1ST SET OF INTERROGATORIES |
|
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Order
Judge: KAI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.