Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Dutia, Dikshit, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Dutia, Kristen N, in the jurisdiction of Prince William County. This case was filed in Prince William County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 26, 2023 |
CategoryDivorce |
Last RefreshedJanuary 22, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPrince William County, VA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
SET 2/9/24 COMP DEF Praecipe |
|
January 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL Motion |
|
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
SET 2/9/24 COMP PLT Praecipe |
|
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
TO COMPEL Motion |
|
December 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
OF APPEARANCE Notice |
|
December 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
TRUIST BANK Subpoena Duces Tecum |
|
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
PRIVATE ADDENDUM Addendum |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
DIKSHIT DUTIA SERVED Affidavit |
|
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
WITHDRAW Motion |
|
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.