Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Rahman, Mushfiqur, filed a(n) Transfer case against Rahman, Prianka, in the jurisdiction of Loudoun County. This case was filed in Loudoun County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2023 |
CategoryTransfer |
Last RefreshedDecember 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLoudoun County, VA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO AS Other |
|
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
CONSENT CUSTODY ORDER Draft Order |
|
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
LEAVE TO FILE ANSWER & CC Consent Order Judge: DLF |
|
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
ANSWER/COUNTERCLAIM Answer And Counterclaim |
|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
DRAFT CONSENT ORDER Draft Order |
|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
VS4 Vital Statistics Form |
|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
TRANSFER PPWK F/FAIRFAX Other |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.