Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Andkhoie, Nihal, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Andkhoie, Edayat, in the jurisdiction of Loudoun County. This case was filed in Loudoun County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 09, 2023 |
CategoryDivorce |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLoudoun County, VA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
PRIVATE TO SDT Addendum |
|
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
PRIVATE TO SDT X2 Addendum |
|
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROT ORDER RE DISCOVERY Order Judge: JEP |
|
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
DRAFT CONSENT ORDER Draft Order |
|
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
DRAFT AGREED PROTECT ORDER Draft Order |
|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
DESIGNATED EXPERT WITNESS Designation Of Experts |
|
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM Answer |
|
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERT OF DISCOVERY Certificate |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
REMOVE 9/22/23 @2PM Praecipe |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
TO PLT PL RELIEF/MOT PL Opposition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.