Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
1St Circuit Division 3 filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Phillips County, AR, . Phillips County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2016 |
CategoryOc - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPhillips County, AR |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OTHER | |
July 16, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER OTHER | |
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED | |
June 11, 2019 | Docket Event | WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED | |
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED | |
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event | WRIT OF GARNISHMENT FILED | |
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event | INTERROGATORIES | |
May 12, 2017 | Docket Event | MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER | |
May 12, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
May 12, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT-DEFAULT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.