Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Smith - Price, Velma, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Price, Mark, in the jurisdiction of Phillips County, AR, . Phillips County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 11, 2015 |
CategoryUd - Landlord/Tenant Unlawfuldetain |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPhillips County, AR |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT-DISMISS RULE 41 | |
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event | MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER | |
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
October 30, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER | |
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED | |
August 27, 2015 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED | |
August 27, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
August 25, 2015 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
August 18, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
August 11, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.