Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Abed, Hatim Najeh, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Abed, Nadia Sammy Hamad, in the jurisdiction of Chesterfield County. This case was filed in Chesterfield County Superior Courts with SCM presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2024 |
CategoryDivorce |
Last RefreshedJune 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationChesterfield County, VA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2024 | Docket Event | Documents Produced | |
May 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion QUASH SDT AMWELL |
|
May 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion QUASH SDT VERITY |
|
May 20, 2024 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVITS | |
May 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order AMEND MOTIONS & DISCOVERY Judge: SCM |
|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Draft Order RE MOTIONS |
|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion TO COMPEL, 2ND |
|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Answer TO INTERROGATORIES |
|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Other ANS TO INTR, REQ FOR PROD |
|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion AMENDED COMPEL & CONT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.