Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Yarbor Ii, Christopher Steven, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Yarbor, Erin Don, in the jurisdiction of Newton County, AR, . Newton County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 16, 2016 |
CategoryDs - Divorce W/Support |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNewton County, AR |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event | MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER | |
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event | DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO | |
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event | DECREE OF DIVORCE | |
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event | DEPOSITION | |
July 11, 2016 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY ORDER | |
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OTHER | |
April 13, 2016 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED | |
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event | RESPONSE/REPLY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.