Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Office Of Child Support, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Mccutcheon, Bryan W, in the jurisdiction of Newton County, AR, . Newton County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 23, 2015 |
CategorySp - Child Support |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNewton County, AR |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event | OCSE WAGE NOTICE | |
February 02, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
February 02, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OTHER | |
February 02, 2016 | Docket Event | MOD OTHER DECREE OR JUDGMENT | |
February 02, 2016 | Docket Event | SHOW CAUSE HEARING HELD | |
December 16, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE | |
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event | SHOW CAUSE HEARING SCHED | |
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event | SHOW CAUSE HEARING CONTD | |
November 05, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE | |
October 30, 2015 | Docket Event | SHOW CAUSE HEARING SCHED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.