Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Duncan, Jacqueline S, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Little River County, AR, . Little River County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 14, 2016 |
CategoryDe - Decedent Estate Administration |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLittle River County, AR |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event | MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER | |
September 26, 2017 | Docket Event | PET APPROVE FINAL ACCOUNTING | |
September 26, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER OTHER | |
September 26, 2017 | Docket Event | DECENDENT ACCOUNTING | |
September 13, 2017 | Docket Event | LETTER SETTING COURT DATE | |
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event | ACCEPT APPOINTMENT | |
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event | INVENTORY OF DECEDENT'S ESTATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.