Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Cawthray, Terry, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Carmikle, Caleb, Hill & Cox Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Hot Spring County, AR, . Hot Spring County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2022 |
CategoryNm - Automobile Tort |
Last RefreshedAugust 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHot Spring County, AR |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF APPEARANCE | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED ANSWER | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF APPEARANCE | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF APPEARANCE | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.