Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
18Th East Circuit Division Iv filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Garland County, AR, . Garland County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2021 |
CategoryOp - Probate - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationGarland County, AR |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | AGREEMENT OF DEPOSITORY | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER PETITION GRANTED | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTERS GUARDIAN PERSON/ESTATE | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | ACCEPT APPOINTMENT | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINT GUARDIAN | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | MOF ORIGINAL | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.