Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, filed a(n) Od - Tort-Other case against Mullins, Richard A, in the jurisdiction of Garland County, AR, . Garland County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 05, 2021 |
CategoryOd - Tort-Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationGarland County, AR |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | MOD DISMISSED | |
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT-DISMISS/NO SERVICE | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER EXTEND SERVICE TIME | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION EXTEND SERVICE TIME | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NON - EST. | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | MOF ORIGINAL | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.