Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
First Security Bank, C O Jarrod A. Overstreet, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Drew County, AR, . Drew County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 26, 2023 |
CategoryDe - Decedent Estate Administration |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationDrew County, AR |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT
Date: June 26, 2023LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT
Date: June 26, 2023PET PROBATE WILL-APPT PERS REP
Date: June 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | LETTERS TESTAMENTARY | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE APPT EXECUTOR/TRIX | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | PET PROBATE WILL-APPT PERS REP | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | MOF ORIGINAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.