Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Wilkins, Virginia D, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Drew County, AR, . Drew County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 10, 2022 |
CategoryDe - Decedent Estate Administration |
Last RefreshedAugust 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationDrew County, AR |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTERS TESTAMENTARY | |
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX | |
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF WILL | |
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event | ACCEPT APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX | |
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION | |
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event | AOC COVERSHEET REOPEN PROBATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.