Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Hillyard, Tina Renae, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Drew County, AR, . Drew County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 08, 2022 |
CategoryDe - Decedent Estate Administration |
Last RefreshedAugust 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationDrew County, AR |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | CONSENT | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | PET AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP | |
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event | FILING - OTHER | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION | |
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | INVENTORY OF DECEDENT'S ESTATE | |
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX | |
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event | RESPONSE/REPLY | |
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF APPEARANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.